WebApr 16, 2024 · 1. We note that the Independent Directors of the Board, namely Dr Chen Seow Phun, John, Mr Nirumalan s/o V Kanapathi Pillai and Mr Tan Boen Eng have all served for more than 9 years on the Board. (i) Please indicate whether the independence of each independent director was subject to WebFeb 27, 2015 · John Chen Seow Phun Age 61 Country Of Principal Residence Singapore The Board's comments on this appointment (including rationale, selection criteria, and …
Change - Announcement of Cessation::Resignation of Non …
WebThe composition of the Board and Board Committees of the Company shall be as follows with effect from 23 June 2024: Board of Directors: Mr. Goi Seng Hui (Non-Executive … WebLiked by John Chen. Experience Executive Chairman Pavillon Holdings Ltd May 2012 - Present 11 years. Chairman SAC Capital Pte Ltd Apr 2004 - … farmers tech support phone number
John Chen, Pavillon Holdings Ltd: Profile and Biography
WebJul 5, 2024 · John Chen Seow Phun Age 67 Is effective date of cessation known? Yes If yes, please provide the date 05/07/2024 Detailed Reason (s) for cessation Dr John Chen tendered his resignation as Non-Executive Chairman and Independent Director of the Company on 5 July 2024 to focus on his other commitments. WebJun 17, 2024 · The Board of Directors of Hanwell Holdings Limited announced the reconstitution of the following Board Committees with immediate effect: Audit and Risk Committee:- Dr. Chen Seow Phun, John Mr.... February 12, 2024 WebMar 25, 2002 · Chen Seow Phun, John, Dr. People’s Action Party Chew Heng Ching. People’s Action Party Chia Kiah Hong, Steve. Non-Constituency Member of Parliament Chiam See Tong. Singapore Democratic Alliance ... farmerstel.com webmail check my email